US HB7045 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 28 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-11-19 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 493.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To require the Secretary of Agriculture to conduct a study on lands that could be included in a National Forest in Hawai'i, and for other purposes. This bill directs the Forest Service to conduct a study to identify available land within the islands of Hawaii, Maui, Molokai, Lanai, Oahu and Kauai that could be included in a national forest in Hawaii.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To require the Secretary of Agriculture to conduct a study on lands that could be included in a National Forest in Hawai'i, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-19HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 493.
2020-11-19HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-600.
2020-07-29HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
2020-07-29HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2020-07-29HouseSubcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged.
2020-06-18HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2020-06-11HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
2020-05-28HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2020-05-28HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback