US HB704 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, And The Internet Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Fair Trade with China Enforcement Act This bill revises trade, finance, and tax provisions with respect to China. The bill directs the Department of Commerce to prohibit the export of certain U.S. technology and intellectual property to China. The bill places a shareholder cap on Chinese investments in certain U.S. corporations. Federal agencies are prohibited from using or procuring telecommunications equipment or services from Huawei Technologies Company, ZTE Corporation, or any other entity reasonably believed to be owned or controlled by China. The bill requires the U.S. Trade Representative to list certain Chinese products that receive support pursuant to China's Made in China 2025 policy. The bill aexpedites the countervailing duty process (i.e., the imposition of duties to offset a subsidy by a foreign government) for products on such a list. The bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to repeal certain reduced withholding rates for residents of China, tax income received by China from certain U.S. investments, and tax income derived from certain Chinese investments. The bill also allows U.S. courts to hear cases against certain entities or corporate affiliates of a foreign state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fair Trade with China Enforcement Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
2019-03-01HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, Foreign Affairs, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, Foreign Affairs, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, Foreign Affairs, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, Foreign Affairs, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, Foreign Affairs, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB702 (Related) 2019-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
SB2 (Related) 2019-02-27 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.

Subjects

Agricultural equipment and machinery
Alliances
Asia
Aviation and airports
China
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Computers and information technology
Corporate finance and management
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Foreign and international banking
Foreign and international corporations
Foreign trade and international finance
Free trade and trade barriers
Genetics
Health technology, devices, supplies
Hong Kong
Human rights
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Income tax exclusion
Income tax rates
Industrial policy and productivity
Intellectual property
Internet and video services
Jurisdiction and venue
Manufacturing
Marine and inland water transportation
Materials
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Motor vehicles
Protest and dissent
Public contracts and procurement
Railroads
Securities
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Tariffs
Taxation of foreign income
Technology transfer and commercialization
Telephone and wireless communication
Trade restrictions
U.S. and foreign investments
Wages and earnings

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback