US HB7034 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-27 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-27 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the deadline for the U.S. Census Bureau to complete the 2020 decennial census of population and related tabulations. The bill requires the bureau to report specified information, such as (1) the total number of field staff, sorted by category; (2) the anticipated schedule of census operations; and (3) total spending on media, advertisements, and partnership specialists. An institution of higher education may provide to the bureau information requested for purposes of enumeration for the 2020 decennial census of population. The bureau may not compile, produce, or publish any data product or tabulation as part of, in combination with, or in connection with the 2020 decennial census of population or any such census data that includes topics specific to the 2020 census that were not part of a report submitted on March 28, 2017, and the 2018 End-to-End Census Test conducted in Providence County, Rhode Island.
Title
Fair and Accurate Census Act
Sponsors
Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] |
Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-05-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-05-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4048 (Related) 2020-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB7974 (Related) 2020-08-07 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB7974 (Related) 2020-08-07 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Appropriations
Census and government statistics
Congressional districts and representation
Congressional oversight
Congressional-executive branch relations
Department of Commerce
Employee hiring
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Higher education
Student records
Census and government statistics
Congressional districts and representation
Congressional oversight
Congressional-executive branch relations
Department of Commerce
Employee hiring
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Higher education
Student records
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7034/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7034/BILLS-116hr7034ih.pdf |