US HB7030 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-6)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To promote competition and reduce gatekeeper power in the app economy, increase choice, improve quality, and reduce costs for consumers.
Title
Open App Markets Act
Sponsors
Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. Ken Buck [R-CO] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Mondaire Jones [D-NY] |
Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. David Cawthorn [R-NC] | Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX] | Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] |
Rep. Lance Gooden [R-TX] | Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] |
Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA] |
Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law. |
2022-03-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2022-03-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5017 (Related) 2021-08-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SB2710 (Related) 2022-02-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 275.
SB2710 (Related) 2022-02-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 275.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/7030/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr7030/BILLS-117hr7030ih.pdf |