US HB7025 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-07-11 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-07-11 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To extend and authorize annual appropriations for the United States Commission on International Religious Freedom through fiscal year 2026.
Title
United States Commission on International Religious Freedom Reauthorization Act of 2024
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] |
Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Andrew Ogles [R-TN] |
Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Rep. Robert Aderholt [R-AL] |
Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA] | Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R-GA] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] | Rep. Nancy Pelosi [D-CA] |
Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] | Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2024-07-10 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-01-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3764 (Same As) 2024-09-30 - Became Public Law No: 118-90.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/7025/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr7025/BILLS-118hr7025ih.pdf |