US HB7025 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on July 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit the Director of the United States Fish and Wildlife Service from funding entities that commit, fund, or support gross violations of internationally recognized human rights, and for other purposes.
Title
Advancing Human Rights-Centered International Conservation Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Cliff Bentz [R-OR] |
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Roll Calls
2022-07-19 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 379 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
2022-07-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-07-19 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 379 - 43 (Roll no. 377). (text: 7/18/2022 CR H6696-6698) |
2022-07-19 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6866-6867) |
2022-07-18 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-07-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7025. |
2022-07-18 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6696-6698) |
2022-07-18 | House | Mr. Huffman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-07-18 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 324. |
2022-07-18 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-417. |
2022-06-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-06-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-06-15 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged. |
2022-03-29 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2022-03-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2022-03-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2022-03-09 | House | Introduced in House |