US HB7001 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act to provide certain employment rights to reservists of the Federal Emergency Management Agency, and for other purposes.
Title
FEMA Intermittent Personnel Employment and Reemployment Rights Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Tim Burchett [R-TN] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] |
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2022-03-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2022-03-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2022-03-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2293 (Related) 2022-09-29 - Became Public Law No: 117-178.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/7001/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr7001/BILLS-117hr7001ih.pdf |