US HB699 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Became Public Law No: 115-110. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Mount Hood Cooper Spur Land Exchange Clarification Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Omnibus Public Land Management Act of 2009 to revise details of the Cooper Spur-Government Camp land exchange between the United States and Oregon. After the final appraised value of the federal and nonfederal lands is determined and approved by the Department of Agriculture (USDA), USDA shall not be required to reappraise or update that value for up to three years, unless the condition of any of the lands is significantly and substantially altered by fire, windstorm, or other events. The bill revises conveyance conditions regarding reservation of a conservation easement to protect identified wetland, reservation of a nonexclusive trail easement, and equalization of values of the exchange properties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mount Hood Cooper Spur Land Exchange Clarification Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-27 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 415 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-10SenateBecame Public Law No: 115-110. (TXT | PDF)
2018-01-10SenateSigned by President.
2017-12-29SenatePresented to President.
2017-12-22SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2017-12-21SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S8267-8269)
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 72.
2017-05-09SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-59.
2017-03-30SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2017-02-28SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
2017-02-27HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-02-27HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 415 - 1 (Roll no. 100). (text: CR H1331)
2017-02-27HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1337)
2017-02-27HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2017-02-27HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 699.
2017-02-27HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1331-1332)
2017-02-27HouseMr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2017-02-10HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
2017-01-24HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-01-24HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB225 (Same As) 2017-05-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 65.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback