US HB6988 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Temporarily permits digital marketplace companies (e.g., Lyft, DoorDash, Airbnb, etc.) to provide benefits to workers during the COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) pandemic without such actions establishing those workers as employees or independent contractors or establishing the company as a joint employer under federal, state, or local laws.applies to digital marketplace companies that provide, among other things, financial assistance, health benefits, training, health checks and personal protective equipment to individuals working through such marketplaces during the period beginning on March 15, 2020, and ending on the later of June 30, 2021, or the expiration of the COVID-19 public health emergency.
Title
Helping Gig Economy Workers Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Carol Miller [R-WV] | Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] |
Rep. Rob Woodall [R-GA] | Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R-PA] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Steve King [R-IA] |
Rep. James Hagedorn [R-MN] | Rep. Ken Buck [R-CO] | Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2020-05-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3773 (Same As) 2020-05-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Digital media
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Health technology, devices, supplies
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Internet and video services
Labor and employment
Labor-management relations
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Self-employed
Service industries
Telephone and wireless communication
Worker safety and health
Digital media
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Health technology, devices, supplies
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Internet and video services
Labor and employment
Labor-management relations
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Self-employed
Service industries
Telephone and wireless communication
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6988/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6988/BILLS-116hr6988ih.pdf |