US HB6943 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-18)
Status: Passed on August 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-16 - Became Public Law No: 117-172.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-18)
Status: Passed on August 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-16 - Became Public Law No: 117-172.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 to authorize public safety officer death benefits to officers suffering from post-traumatic stress disorder or acute stress disorder, and for other purposes.
Title
Public Safety Officer Support Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 402 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-16 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-172. |
2022-08-16 | House | Signed by President. |
2022-08-15 | House | Presented to President. |
2022-08-02 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3826) |
2022-08-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2022-05-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-05-18 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays (2/3 required): 402 - 17 (Roll No. 223). |
2022-05-18 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5167-5168) |
2022-05-18 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-05-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6943. |
2022-05-18 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5120-5123; text: CR H5120-5121) |
2022-05-18 | House | Mr. Cohen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-05-18 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 252. |
2022-05-18 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 117-335. |
2022-05-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2022-05-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-03-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2022-03-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3635 (Same As) 2022-06-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 420.