US HB694 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Passenger Rail Investment Improvement Act of 2008 to prohibit certain funding to the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority until certain conditions are met, and for other purposes.
Title
Metro Accountability and Investment Act
Sponsors
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Steny Hoyer [D-MD] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] |
Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA] | Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD] | Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] |
Rep. David Trone [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2021-02-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3684 (Related) 2022-08-04 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
HR504 (Similar To) 2021-06-29 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR504 (Similar To) 2021-06-29 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/694/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr694/BILLS-117hr694ih.pdf |