US HB6933 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-10)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to improve and to expand eligibility for dependency and indemnity compensation paid to certain survivors of certain veterans.
Title
Caring for Survivors Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA] | Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] |
Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] | Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] |
Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] | Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] |
Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] |
Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] |
Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX] | Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX] | Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA] | Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] |
Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] |
Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD] | Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA] |
Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2020-05-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2020-05-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4594 (Related) 2020-09-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB8559 (Related) 2020-10-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB8559 (Related) 2020-10-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Disability assistance
Marriage and family status
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Disability assistance
Marriage and family status
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6933/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6933/BILLS-116hr6933ih.pdf |