US HB6899 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on October 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-04 - Became Public Law No: 117-185.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on October 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-04 - Became Public Law No: 117-185.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit the Secretary of the Treasury from engaging in transactions involving the exchange of Special Drawing Rights issued by the International Monetary Fund that are held by the Russian Federation or Belarus.
Title
Russia and Belarus SDR Exchange Prohibition Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. French Hill [R-AR] | Rep. David Kustoff [R-TN] | Rep. Bryan Steil [R-WI] | Rep. William Timmons [R-SC] |
Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Warren Davidson [R-OH] |
Rep. John Rose [R-TN] | Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Trey Hollingsworth [R-IN] |
Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 417 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-04 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-185. |
2022-10-04 | House | Signed by President. |
2022-09-28 | House | Presented to President. |
2022-09-22 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-09-21 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4940) |
2022-07-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 452. |
2022-07-21 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez without amendment. Without written report. |
2022-07-19 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2022-05-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-05-11 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 417 - 2 (Roll no. 162). (text: 05/10/2022 CR H4754) |
2022-05-11 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4840-4841) |
2022-05-10 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-05-10 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6899. |
2022-05-10 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4754-4755) |
2022-05-10 | House | Mr. Garcia (IL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-05-10 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 236. |
2022-05-10 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 117-316. |
2022-03-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Voice Vote. |
2022-03-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-03-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2022-03-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4079 (Related) 2022-04-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.