US HB6897 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-29 - Became Public Law No: 115-250. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-29 - Became Public Law No: 115-250. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Airport and Airway Extension Act of 2018, Part II (Sec. 2) This bill extends: (1) airport planning and development and noise compatibility planning and programs at increased levels until October 7, 2018; (2) various expiring aviation authorities, including those under the Vision 100-Century of Aviation Reauthorization Act and the FAA Modernization and Reform Act of 2012, through such date; (3) the expenditure authority of the Airport and Airway Trust Fund through October 8, 2018, and (4) excise taxes for such fund through such date.
Title
Airport and Airway Extension Act of 2018, Part II
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Shuster [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-29 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-250. (TXT | PDF) |
2018-09-29 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-09-28 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-09-28 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-09-28 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6390-6391) |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2018-09-26 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-26 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H9060) |
2018-09-26 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9060) |
2018-09-26 | House | Committee on Ways and Means discharged. |
2018-09-26 | House | Committee on Transportation discharged. |
2018-09-26 | House | Mr. Shuster asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2018-09-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-09-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-09-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Aviation and airports
Consumer affairs
Government trust funds
Land use and conservation
Motor fuels
Noise pollution
Pacific Ocean
Rural conditions and development
Sales and excise taxes
Small towns
State and local government operations
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
U.S. territories and protectorates
Aviation and airports
Consumer affairs
Government trust funds
Land use and conservation
Motor fuels
Noise pollution
Pacific Ocean
Rural conditions and development
Sales and excise taxes
Small towns
State and local government operations
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
U.S. territories and protectorates