US HB6878 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-3)
Status: Engrossed on December 5 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-05 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 5 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-05 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To address the health needs of incarcerated women related to pregnancy and childbirth, and for other purposes.
Title
Pregnant Women in Custody Act
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA] | Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA] | Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] |
Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI] | Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX] | Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] | Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] |
Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] |
Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] |
Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] |
Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] |
Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Shontel Brown [D-OH] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Troy Carter [D-LA] |
Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Tracey Mann [R-KS] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] |
Rep. Melanie Stansbury [D-NM] |
Roll Calls
2022-12-01 - House - Passage of a Measure (Y: 324 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2022-12-01 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-12-01 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 324 - 90 (Roll no. 493). |
2022-12-01 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8694-8695) |
2022-12-01 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 6878, the Chair put the question on passage of the bill and by voice vote announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Fitzgerald demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. |
2022-12-01 | House | H.Amdt.328 On agreeing to the Frankel, Lois amendment (A002) Agreed to by voice vote. |
2022-12-01 | House | H.Amdt.328 The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A002) and the bill pursuant to the rule. |
2022-12-01 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 1499, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Lois Frankel amendment No. 1. |
2022-12-01 | House | H.Amdt.328 Amendment (A002) offered by Ms. Frankel, Lois. (consideration: CR H8693; text: CR H8693) |
2022-12-01 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 6878. |
2022-12-01 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3372, H.R. 6878, H.R. 8876 and H.J. Res. 100. The resolution provides for adoption of H. Res. 1495 and H. Con. Res. 118. |
2022-12-01 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1499. (consideration: CR H8686-8693; text: CR H8687-8689) |
2022-11-30 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1499 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3372, H.R. 6878, H.R. 8876 and H.J. Res. 100. The resolution provides for adoption of H. Res. 1495 and H. Con. Res. 118. |
2022-09-13 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 361. |
2022-09-13 | House | Committee on the Budget discharged. |
2022-09-13 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 117-465, Part I. |
2022-07-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2022-07-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-03-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2022-03-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB5027 (Related) 2022-09-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR1499 (Related) 2022-11-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1499 (Related) 2022-11-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.