US HB6865 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize appropriations for the Coast Guard, and for other purposes.
Title
Ocean Shipping Reform Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] | Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH] |
Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 378 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2022-03-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-03-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 378 - 46 (Roll no. 85). (text: CR H3901-3919) |
2022-03-29 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3950-3951) |
2022-03-29 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-03-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6865. |
2022-03-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3901-3925) |
2022-03-29 | House | Mr. DeFazio moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-03-29 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 209. |
2022-03-29 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 117-282. |
2022-03-02 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2022-03-02 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-03-02 | House | Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation Discharged. |
2022-03-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation. |
2022-02-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2022-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB628 (Related) 2021-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB5114 (Related) 2021-08-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
HB6831 (Related) 2022-02-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
HB6882 (Related) 2022-03-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
HB4996 (Related) 2021-12-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB5114 (Related) 2021-08-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
HB6831 (Related) 2022-02-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
HB6882 (Related) 2022-03-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
HB4996 (Related) 2021-12-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.