US HB6853 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Responds to the COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) public health emergency by increasing volunteer opportunities within AmeriCorps and employment opportunities at the Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA), and requiring the re-enrollment of Peace Corps volunteers whose service ended involuntarily on March 15, 2020, or earlier for volunteers who were serving in China and Mongolia. Among other things, the bill reauthorizes through FY2022 AmeriCorps programs; increases recruitment levels of its volunteers to 500,000 in FY2020-FY2022; sets the minimum compensation for AmeriCorps volunteers, beginning in FY2020, at 200% of the poverty line applicable to a family of one; increases the ceiling on grant amounts to such volunteers from $18,000 to $25,000 and the grant maximum amount limit to meet program needs; requires FEMA to appoint, administer, and expedite the training of an additional 62,000 Cadre of On-Call Response/Recovery Employees in FY2020-FY2022 above the level of such employees in FY2019 to address the COVID-19 health emergency; and authorizes the President to pay a state, tribal, or local government in which a major disaster has been declared stipends for temporary workers conducting nonpartisan official election poll worker services.
Title
UNITE Act of 2020 Undertaking National Initiatives to Tackle Epidemic Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] |
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] |
Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2020-05-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-05-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-05-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3642 (Related) 2020-05-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Adult education and literacy
Aging
Bankruptcy
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Census and government statistics
Citizenship and naturalization
Congressional oversight
Consumer credit
Corporation for National and Community Service
Department of Homeland Security
Disaster relief and insurance
Education of the disadvantaged
Educational technology and distance education
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Elementary and secondary education
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Emergency planning and evacuation
Employee hiring
Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Food assistance and relief
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health technology, devices, supplies
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Immigration status and procedures
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Internet and video services
Labor and employment
National and community service
Natural disasters
Peace Corps
Public-private cooperation
Rural conditions and development
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
State and local government operations
Temporary and part-time employment
Unemployment
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Wages and earnings
Worker safety and health
World health
Aging
Bankruptcy
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Census and government statistics
Citizenship and naturalization
Congressional oversight
Consumer credit
Corporation for National and Community Service
Department of Homeland Security
Disaster relief and insurance
Education of the disadvantaged
Educational technology and distance education
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Elementary and secondary education
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Emergency planning and evacuation
Employee hiring
Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Food assistance and relief
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health technology, devices, supplies
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Immigration status and procedures
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Internet and video services
Labor and employment
National and community service
Natural disasters
Peace Corps
Public-private cooperation
Rural conditions and development
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
State and local government operations
Temporary and part-time employment
Unemployment
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Wages and earnings
Worker safety and health
World health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6853/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6853/BILLS-116hr6853ih.pdf |