US HB6845 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for transparent licensing of commercial remote sensing systems.
Title
Commercial Remote Sensing Amendment Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2022-07-26 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-07-26 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7089) |
2022-07-26 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6845. |
2022-07-26 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7089-7090) |
2022-07-26 | House | Mr. Beyer moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-07-01 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 307. |
2022-07-01 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 117-399. |
2022-04-05 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2022-04-05 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-02-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. |
2022-02-25 | House | Introduced in House |