US HB684 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 148-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize the Keystone XL Pipeline.
Title
Keystone XL Pipeline Construction and Jobs Preservation Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-02-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB171 (Same As) 2021-02-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB6858 (Related) 2022-03-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
HB6884 (Related) 2022-03-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
SB3714 (Related) 2022-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB3752 (Related) 2022-03-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB6858 (Related) 2022-03-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
HB6884 (Related) 2022-03-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
SB3714 (Related) 2022-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB3752 (Related) 2022-03-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/684/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr684/BILLS-117hr684ih.pdf |