US HB6827 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 254.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 254.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize appropriations to accelerate the procurement and deployment of computed tomography equipment to enhance detection capabilities for carry-on baggage, and for other purposes.
Title
Securing the Checkpoint Property Screening System (S-CPSS) Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Carlos Gimenez [R-FL] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 254. |
2022-05-24 | House | Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 117-337. |
2022-03-02 | House | Subcommittee on Transportation and Maritime Security Discharged. |
2022-03-02 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2022-03-02 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-02-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Maritime Security. |
2022-02-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2022-02-25 | House | Introduced in House |