US HB6813 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-31)
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-19 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 571.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the Department of Justice (DOJ) to review and update, if necessary, certain best practices, replication guides, and other training materials for law enforcement, judicial officials, and others whose work may bring them in contact with elder abuse. Specifically, DOJ must address victims and witnesses who have Alzheimer's disease and related dementias in these materials. Additionally, in creating or compiling these materials, DOJ must consult with the Department of Health and Human Services and, as appropriate, other entities with relevant expertise in elder abuse.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Promoting Alzheimer's Awareness to Prevent Elder Abuse Act

Sponsors

Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA]Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ]Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]
Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY]Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ]
Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]
Rep. William Keating [D-MA]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]
Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]Rep. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK]
Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Michael Conaway [R-TX]Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]
Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL]Rep. William Timmons [R-SC]Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA]Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX]Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA]
Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]Rep. Ben Cline [R-VA]Rep. Martha Roby [R-AL]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]
Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN]Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL]Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO]Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI]
Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE]
Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]
Rep. Doug Collins [R-GA]Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL]Rep. John Katko [R-NY]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]
Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Tom Graves [R-GA]Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR]
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC]Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]
Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH]Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ]Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX]
Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL]
Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]
Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI]Rep. Joe Cunningham [D-SC]Rep. Gregory Pence [R-IN]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-19SenateReceived in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 571.
2020-10-01HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-10-01HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5159-5161)
2020-10-01HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6813.
2020-10-01HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5159-5163)
2020-10-01HouseMs. Bass moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2020-09-24HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 435.
2020-09-24HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-535.
2020-09-15HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2020-05-12HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2020-05-12HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB3703 (Same As) 2020-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 116-252. (TXT | PDF)
SB4182 (Related) 2020-07-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8114 (Related) 2020-08-25 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Ways and Means, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback