US HB6781 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Paycheck Protection Program Improved Coordination Act of 2020 This bill coordinates the Paycheck Protection Program (PPP), established to support small businesses in response to COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019), with the employee retention tax credit for employers subject to closure due to COVID-19, by allowing loan amounts not forgiven under the PPP to be taken into account for purposes of the retention tax credit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Paycheck Protection Program Improved Coordination Act of 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-05-08HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-05-08HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB6776 (Related) 2020-05-08 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
SB3793 (Related) 2020-05-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4318 (Related) 2020-07-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4268 (Related) 2020-07-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4818 (Related) 2020-10-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback