US HB6780 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on December 21 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-21 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 21 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-21 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 7521 Paula Drive in Tampa, Florida, as the "Major Andreas O'Keeffe Post Office Building". Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 7521 Paula Drive in Tampa, Florida, as the "Major Andreas O'Keeffe Post Office Building."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 7521 Paula Drive in Tampa, Florida, as the "Major Andreas O'Keeffe Post Office Building".
Sponsors
Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] | Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] |
Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] | Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL] | Rep. Dennis Ross [R-FL] | Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] |
Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] | Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] |
Rep. Daniel Webster [R-FL] | Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL] | Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] |
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] |
Rep. Thomas Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] | Rep. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen [R-FL] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] |
Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-21 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7528) |
2018-10-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-09-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-28 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H9357) |
2018-09-28 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9357) |
2018-09-28 | House | Mr. Comer asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2018-09-28 | House | Committee on Oversight and Government discharged. |
2018-09-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-09-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-09-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2018-09-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Florida
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
Postal service
Florida
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
Postal service