US HB677 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 132-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Addresses policies and issues regarding policing practices and law enforcement accountability. The bill funds state and local grants, incentivizes state and local reporting on the use of certain policing practices, creates new federal offenses for certain misconduct, and establishes best practices and training requirements. The bill funds state and local grants, including to support the use of body-worn cameras, to implement information sharing systems for disciplinary records of law enforcement officers, and to prohibit officers from engaging in sexual acts under color of the law. Further, it requires state and local governments that receive grants under the Edward Byrne Memorial Justice Assistance Grant program to report information related to use-of-force incidents and the use of no-knock warrants. At the federal level, the bill establishes new criminal offenses related to falsifying police reports and engaging in sexual acts under color of law. The bill directs the Department of Justice to develop training on de-escalation tactics, behavioral health crises, alternatives to the use of force, and the duty to intervene when another officer uses excessive force. Finally, the bill establishes and funds the National Criminal Justice Commission. Among other tasks, the commission must develop best practices for policing tactics and procedures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JUSTICE Act Just and Unifying Solutions To Invigorate Communities Everywhere Act of 2021

Sponsors

Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN]Rep. Ashley Hinson [R-IA]Rep. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK]Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC]
Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL]Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH]Rep. Carol Miller [R-WV]Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO]
Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI]Rep. Tom Rice [R-SC]Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA]Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH]
Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL]Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN]Rep. Robert Aderholt [R-AL]Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA]
Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH]Rep. David Joyce [R-OH]Rep. John Katko [R-NY]Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO]
Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA]Rep. French Hill [R-AR]Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE]Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX]
Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA]Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH]Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX]Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA]
Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH]Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI]Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV]Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR]
Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA]Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ]Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN]Rep. Tim Burchett [R-TN]
Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT]Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY]Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC]Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA]
Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC]Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX]Rep. James Baird [R-IN]Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ]
Rep. John Curtis [R-UT]Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR]Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS]Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX]
Rep. Ron Estes [R-KS]Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ]Rep. Kevin Hern [R-OK]Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL]
Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN]Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR]Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI]Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL]
Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH]Rep. Don Young [R-AK]Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY]Rep. John Carter [R-TX]
Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX]Rep. James Hagedorn [R-MN]Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY]Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD]
Rep. William Timmons [R-SC]Rep. Steve Scalise [R-LA]Rep. Gregory Pence [R-IN]Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ]
Rep. Troy Nehls [R-TX]Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY]Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA]Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK]
Rep. Blake Moore [R-UT]Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL]Rep. Mike Garcia [R-CA]Rep. David McKinley [R-WV]
Rep. August Pfluger [R-TX]Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI]Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX]Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN]
Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL]Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY]Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA]Rep. John Joyce [R-PA]
Rep. Burgess Owens [R-UT]Rep. Stephanie Bice [R-OK]Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX]Rep. Scott Franklin [R-FL]
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Fred Keller [R-PA]Rep. Ben Cline [R-VA]Rep. Diana Harshbarger [R-TN]
Rep. Randy Feenstra [R-IA]Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA]Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA]Rep. Tracey Mann [R-KS]
Rep. Harold Rogers [R-KY]Rep. Bryan Steil [R-WI]Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL]Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA]
Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX]Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R-GA]Rep. Trent Kelly [R-MS]Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO]
Rep. Jay Obernolte [R-CA]Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL]Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA]Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY]
Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA]Rep. Daniel Webster [R-FL]Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA]Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI]
Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC]Rep. David Valadao [R-CA]Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE]Rep. Kelly Armstrong [R-ND]
Rep. Cliff Bentz [R-OR]Rep. Patrick Fallon [R-TX]Rep. Mike Johnson [R-LA]Rep. Greg Murphy [R-NC]
Rep. James Comer [R-KY]Rep. Kevin McCarthy [R-CA]Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA]Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH]
Rep. Byron Donalds [R-FL]Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC]Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH]Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH]
Rep. Nicole Malliotakis [R-NY]Rep. Michelle Steel [R-CA]Rep. Young Kim [R-CA]Rep. Jacob Laturner [R-KS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-22HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
2021-02-01HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-02-01HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-02-01HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-02-01HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB575 (Related) 2021-03-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1727 (Related) 2021-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB2172 (Related) 2021-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.

Subjects

Advisory bodies
Appropriations
Assault and harassment offenses
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Department of Justice
Detention of persons
Disability and paralysis
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Due process and equal protection
Employee hiring
Employee performance
Employment and training programs
Evidence and witnesses
Executive agency funding and structure
Firearms and explosives
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hate crimes
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Judicial procedure and administration
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Mental health
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Performance measurement
Personnel records
Photography and imaging
Public contracts and procurement
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion
Sex offenses
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Violent crime

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback