US HB676 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-23 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-23 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the appropriation or use of funds to withdraw the United States from the North Atlantic Treaty Organization.
Title
NATO Support Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX] |
Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] |
Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] |
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-22 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 44 (Y: 357 N: 22 NV: 54 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2019-01-22 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-01-22 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 357 - 22 (Roll no. 44). (text: CR H976) |
2019-01-22 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H981-982) |
2019-01-22 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-01-22 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 676. |
2019-01-22 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H976-979) |
2019-01-22 | House | Mr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-01-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Alliances
Collective security
Conflicts and wars
Congressional-executive branch relations
Defense spending
Europe
International affairs
International law and treaties
Military operations and strategy
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Military readiness
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Collective security
Conflicts and wars
Congressional-executive branch relations
Defense spending
Europe
International affairs
International law and treaties
Military operations and strategy
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Military readiness
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents