US HB676 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 124-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - ASSUMING FIRST SPONSORSHIP - Mr. Ellison asked unanimous consent that he may hereafter be considered as the first sponsor of H.R. 676, a bill originally introduced by former Representative Conyers, for purposes of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings pursuant to clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expanded & Improved Medicare For All Act This bill establishes the Medicare for All Program to provide all individuals residing in the United States and U.S. territories with free health care that includes all medically necessary care, such as primary care and prevention, dietary and nutritional therapies, prescription drugs, emergency care, long-term care, mental health services, dental services, and vision care. Only public or nonprofit institutions may participate. Nonprofit health maintenance organizations (HMOs) that deliver care in their own facilities may participate. Patients may choose from participating physicians and institutions. Health insurers may not sell health insurance that duplicates the benefits provided under this bill. Insurers may sell benefits that are not medically necessary, such as cosmetic surgery benefits. The bill sets forth methods to pay institutional providers and health professionals for services. Financial incentives between HMOs and physicians based on utilization are prohibited. The program is funded: (1) from existing sources of government revenues for health care, (2) by increasing personal income taxes on the top 5% of income earners, (3) by instituting a progressive excise tax on payroll and self-employment income, (4) by instituting a tax on unearned income, and (5) by instituting a tax on stock and bond transactions. Amounts that would have been appropriated for federal public health care programs, including Medicare, Medicaid, and the Children's Health Insurance Program (CHIP), are transferred and appropriated to carry out this bill. The program must give employment transition benefits and first priority in retraining and job placement to individuals whose jobs are eliminated due to reduced clerical and administrative work under this bill. The Department of Health and Human Services must create a confidential electronic patient record system. The bill establishes a National Board of Universal Quality and Access to provide advice on quality, access, and affordability. The Indian Health Service must be integrated into the program after five years. Congress must evaluate the continued independence of Department of Veterans Affairs health programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expanded & Improved Medicare For All Act

Sponsors

Rep. John Conyers [D-MI]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA]
Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO]Rep. James Clyburn [D-SC]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD]
Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN]Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]
Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA]Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY]Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]
Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH]Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY]Rep. John Lewis [D-GA]Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]
Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Robert Brady [D-PA]Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]
Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]
Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Richard Nolan [D-MN]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]
Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC]
Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]Rep. Al Green [D-TX]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]
Rep. Luis Gutierrez [D-IL]Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]
Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]
Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]Rep. Michael Capuano [D-MA]Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC]
Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH]Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]
Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]
Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]
Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. Gene Green [D-TX]
Rep. David Price [D-NC]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]
Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]
Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]
Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA]Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO]Rep. Gregorio Sablan [I-MP]
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA]
Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]
Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA]Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]
Rep. Peter Visclosky [D-IN]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Joseph Crowley [D-NY]
Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX]Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY]Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]
Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA]Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX]Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]
Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL]Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ]Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX]
Rep. Brenda Jones [D-MI]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07HouseASSUMING FIRST SPONSORSHIP - Mr. Ellison asked unanimous consent that he may hereafter be considered as the first sponsor of H.R. 676, a bill originally introduced by former Representative Conyers, for purposes of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings pursuant to clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection.
2017-02-10HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
2017-02-07HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2017-01-24HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-01-24HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-01-24HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-01-24HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-01-24HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback