US HB6722 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on December 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 117-235.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on December 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 117-235.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the Department of Veterans Affairs community-based outpatient clinic in French Camp, California, as the "Richard A. Pittman VA Clinic".
Title
To designate the Department of Veterans Affairs community-based outpatient clinic in French Camp, California, as the "Richard A. Pittman VA Clinic".
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] |
Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] | Rep. Jay Obernolte [R-CA] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] |
Rep. Young Kim [R-CA] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Sara Jacobs [D-CA] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] |
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-20 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-235. |
2022-12-20 | House | Signed by President. |
2022-12-16 | House | Presented to President. |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-12-06 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7008) |
2022-12-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-11-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2022-11-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-11-14 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8447) |
2022-11-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6722. |
2022-11-14 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8447-8449) |
2022-11-14 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-03-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2022-02-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2022-02-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6313 (Related) 2022-01-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.