US HB6720 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 497.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 497.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize the Thomas Paine Memorial Association to establish a commemorative work in the District of Columbia and its environs, and for other purposes.
Title
To authorize the Thomas Paine Memorial Association to establish a commemorative work in the District of Columbia and its environs, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] |
Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA] | Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] |
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] |
Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Melanie Stansbury [D-NM] | Rep. Jay Obernolte [R-CA] |
Rep. Victoria Spartz [R-IN] | Rep. Deborah Ross [D-NC] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] |
Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-30 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 497. |
2022-12-30 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-680. |
2022-12-08 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-12-08 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-12-08 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2022-07-14 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2022-02-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2022-02-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2022-02-11 | House | Introduced in House |