US HB6662 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-09-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Empowering Seniors' Enrollment Decision Act of 2018 This bill provides statutory authority for the extension of a special enrollment period under Medicare Advantage (MA) to enrollees in certain Medicare Cost plans that are not transitioning into qualifying MA plans. Current regulations allow such enrollees (i.e., non-deemed individuals) to participate in the special enrollment period.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Empowering Seniors' Enrollment Decision Act of 2018

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-17SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2018-09-12HouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
2018-09-12HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-09-12HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8120-8121)
2018-09-12HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6662.
2018-09-12HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8120-8121)
2018-09-12HouseMr. Paulsen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2018-09-10HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 726.
2018-09-10HouseCommittee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
2018-09-10HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-935, Part I.
2018-09-05HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Voice Vote.
2018-09-05HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2018-08-10HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2018-08-10HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2018-08-10HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback