US HB6651 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-11 - Became Public Law No: 115-305.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

PEPFAR Extension Act of 2018 This bill amends the United States Leadership Against HIV/AIDS, Tuberculosis, and Malaria Act of 2003 to extend certain provisions related to the U.S. President's Emergency Plan for AIDS Relief (PEPFAR), a government initiative addressing the global HIV/AIDS epidemic. Specifically, the bill extends through FY2023 provisions that: require the Inspectors General of the Department of State and the U.S. Agency for Global Media, jointly with the Department of Health and Human Services and the U.S. Agency for International Development, to coordinate and conduct oversight of PEPFAR programs, limit U.S. contributions to the Global Fund to Fight AIDS, Tuberculosis and Malaria to 33% of funds contributed from all sources, require that certain fund contributions be withheld under specified circumstances, such as if funds were previously used to assist a country that has repeatedly supported acts of international terrorism, and require that more than half of the PEPFAR budget be allocated for specified HIV/AIDS treatment and care. The bill also extends through FY2024 annual reporting requirements relating to HIV/AIDS treatment providers and costs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEPFAR Extension Act of 2018

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-11SenateBecame Public Law No: 115-305.
2018-12-11SenateSigned by President.
2018-11-30SenatePresented to President.
2018-11-29SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2018-11-28SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7193-7194)
2018-11-14SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
2018-11-13HouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
2018-11-13HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-11-13HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H 9488)
2018-11-13HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6651.
2018-11-13HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9488-9491)
2018-11-13HouseMr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2018-11-09HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 793.
2018-11-09HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Foreign Affairs. H. Rept. 115-1014.
2018-09-27HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules, by Unanimous Consent.
2018-09-27HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
2018-09-27HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2018-08-03HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
2018-08-03HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB6856 (Related) 2018-09-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
SB3476 (Related) 2018-10-03 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 619.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback