US HB6647 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-3)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-19 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-19 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to make certain improvements relating to the eligibility of veterans to receive reimbursement for emergency treatment furnished through the Veterans Community Care program, and for other purposes.
Title
To amend title 38, United States Code, to make certain improvements relating to the eligibility of veterans to receive reimbursement for emergency treatment furnished through the Veterans Community Care program, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] | Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Patrick Fallon [R-TX] |
Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. David Cawthorn [R-NC] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] |
Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] |
Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV] | Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH] | Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] | Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] |
Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. Michael Cloud [R-TX] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2022-07-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-07-18 | House | Subcommittee on Health Discharged. |
2022-03-16 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2022-02-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2022-02-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2022-02-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/6647/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr6647/BILLS-117hr6647ih.pdf |