US HB6645 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Harmful Algal Bloom and Hypoxia Research and Control Act of 2018
Title
Harmful Algal Bloom and Hypoxia Research and Control Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] |
Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] | Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] |
Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL] | Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA] |
Rep. Dana Rohrabacher [R-CA] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] |
Rep. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen [R-FL] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans. |
2018-07-31 | House | Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-07-31 | House | Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-07-31 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3665 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
HB4417 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
SB1057 (Related) 2017-09-27 - Held at the desk.
HB4417 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
SB1057 (Related) 2017-09-27 - Held at the desk.
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/6645/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr6645/BILLS-115hr6645ih.pdf |