US HB6617 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-18 - Became Public Law No: 117-86.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-18 - Became Public Law No: 117-86.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Making further continuing appropriations for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2022, and for other purposes.
Title
Further Additional Extending Government Funding Act Further Additional Continuing Appropriations Act, 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - Senate - Passed Senate, under the order of 2/17/2022, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, without amendment (Y: 65 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure (Y: 65 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Amendment SA 4930, under the order of 2/17/2022, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was S.Amdt.4930 (Y: 47 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Amendment SA 4929 S.Amdt.4929 (Y: 46 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Amendment SA 4927 S.Amdt.4927 (Y: 44 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2022-02-08 - House - On passage (Y: 272 N: 162 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure (Y: 65 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Amendment SA 4930, under the order of 2/17/2022, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was S.Amdt.4930 (Y: 47 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Amendment SA 4929 S.Amdt.4929 (Y: 46 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Amendment SA 4927 S.Amdt.4927 (Y: 44 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2022-02-08 - House - On passage (Y: 272 N: 162 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-86. |
2022-02-18 | House | Signed by President. |
2022-02-18 | House | Presented to President. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, under the order of 2/17/2022, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 65 - 27. Record Vote Number: 64. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | S.Amdt.4929 Amendment SA 4929 proposed by Senator Lee. (consideration: CR S775-776, S777-778; text: CR S775) To prohibit funding for COVID-19 vaccine mandates. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | S.Amdt.4930 Amendment SA 4930 proposed by Senator Braun. (consideration: CR S778-779; text: CR S778) To strike the Statutory PAYGO exemption and require balanced budgets in concurrent resolutions on the budget. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | S.Amdt.4929 Amendment SA 4929 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 46 - 47. Record Vote Number: 61. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | S.Amdt.4927 Amendment SA 4927 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 44 - 49. Record Vote Number: 62. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | S.Amdt.4927 Amendment SA 4927 proposed by Senator Cruz. (consideration: CR S776-777, S777-778; text: CR S776) To prohibit the use of Federal funding for schools and early childhood development facilities that enforce COVID-19 vaccine mandates on children in order to protect the rights of parents to make medical decisions that affect their child. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | S.Amdt.4930 Amendment SA 4930, under the order of 2/17/2022, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 47 - 45. Record Vote Number: 63. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S775-779) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 65 - 30. Record Vote Number: 60. (CR S765) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (CR S757) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure presented in Senate. (CR S703) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S703) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 267. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
2022-02-08 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-02-08 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 272 - 162 (Roll no. 39). (text: CR H1052) |
2022-02-08 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1057-1058) |
2022-02-08 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 6617, the Chair put the question on passage and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Ms. Granger demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair announced that further proceedings on the question of passage would be postponed. |
2022-02-08 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2022-02-08 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 6617. |
2022-02-08 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3076 and H.R. 6617. The resolution provides for one hour of general debate for both bills. H.R. 6617 is being considered under a closed rule and H.R. 3076 is being considered under a structured rule. The resolution provides that H. Con. Res. 69 is considered adopted and provides that for purposes of the joint session to receive the President of the United States on March 1, 2022, former Members, Delegates, and Resident Commissioners shall not be admitted to the Hall of the House or rooms leading thereto. |
2022-02-08 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 912. (consideration: CR H1051-1056) |
2022-02-08 | House | Rule H. Res. 912 passed House. |
2022-02-07 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 912 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3076 and H.R. 6617. The resolution provides for one hour of general debate for both bills. H.R. 6617 is being considered under a closed rule and H.R. 3076 is being considered under a structured rule. The resolution provides that H. Con. Res. 69 is considered adopted and provides that for purposes of the joint session to receive the President of the United States on March 1, 2022, former Members, Delegates, and Resident Commissioners shall not be admitted to the Hall of the House or rooms leading thereto. |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2022-02-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR912 (Related) 2022-02-08 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2430 (Related) 2021-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB2630 (Related) 2021-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB2430 (Related) 2021-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB2630 (Related) 2021-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.