US HB6614 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-19 - Became Public Law No: 117-234.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-19 - Became Public Law No: 117-234.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 4744 Grand River Avenue in Detroit, Michigan, as the "Rosa Louise McCauley Parks Post Office Building".
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 4744 Grand River Avenue in Detroit, Michigan, as the "Rosa Louise McCauley Parks Post Office Building".
Sponsors
Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] | Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] |
Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] | Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI] | Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI] | Rep. Lisa McClain [R-MI] |
Rep. Peter Meijer [R-MI] | Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI] | Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] | Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI] |
Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] | Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-19 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-234. |
2022-12-19 | House | Signed by President. |
2022-12-16 | House | Presented to President. |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-12-06 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7009) |
2022-08-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 477. |
2022-08-04 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters without amendment. Without written report. |
2022-08-03 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-05-10 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-05-10 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4787) |
2022-05-10 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6614. |
2022-05-10 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4786-4787) |
2022-05-10 | House | Mrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-04-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-04-06 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-02-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2022-02-04 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H964-965) |
2022-02-04 | House | Introduced in House |