US HB66 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Route 66 Centennial Commission Act (Sec. 3) This bill establishes the Route 66 Centennial Commission to honor highway Route 66 on the occasion of its centennial anniversary. (Sec. 4) The bill sets forth the duties of the commission, its membership, powers, and reporting requirements. (Sec. 9) The Department of Transportation shall prepare a plan on the preservation needs of Route 66. (Sec. 10) The commission shall terminate not later than June 30, 2027.
Title
Route 66 Centennial Commission Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
2018-07-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-07-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6215-6216) |
2018-07-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 66. |
2018-07-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6215-6219) |
2018-07-16 | House | Mr. Davis, Rodney moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-07-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 635. |
2018-07-16 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 115-821. |
2018-06-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-06-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-06-27 | House | Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Discharged. |
2017-01-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2017-01-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Commemorative events and holidays
Government studies and investigations
Historic sites and heritage areas
Roads and highways
Transportation and public works
U.S. history
Commemorative events and holidays
Government studies and investigations
Historic sites and heritage areas
Roads and highways
Transportation and public works
U.S. history