US HB6591 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-10-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 501 South Kirkman Road in Orlando, Florida, as the "Napoleon 'Nap' Ford Post Office Building". Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 501 South Kirkman Road in Orlando, Florida, as the "Napoleon 'Nap' Ford Post Office Building."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 501 South Kirkman Road in Orlando, Florida, as the "Napoleon 'Nap' Ford Post Office Building".

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-01SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2018-09-28HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-09-28HouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H9357-9358)
2018-09-28HouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9357-9358)
2018-09-28HouseMr. Comer asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
2018-09-28HouseCommittee on Oversight and Government discharged.
2018-09-27HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
2018-09-27HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2018-07-26HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
2018-07-26HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback