US HB6583 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-05 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-05 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Big Sand Wash Project Title Transfer Act
Title
Big Sand Wash Project Title Transfer Act
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-05 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2018-08-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans. |
2018-07-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2018-07-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3472 (Related) 2018-09-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/6583/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr6583/BILLS-115hr6583ih.pdf |