US HB6559 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-26 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-26 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Social Security Administration Modernization Act of 2018
Title
Social Security Administration Modernization Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Johnson [R-TX] | Rep. Tom Rice [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-07-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-07-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3097 (Related) 2017-07-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
HB3385 (Related) 2017-07-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3432 (Related) 2017-07-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3594 (Related) 2017-09-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
HB6084 (Related) 2018-07-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3309 (Related) 2018-09-10 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 723.
HB3385 (Related) 2017-07-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3432 (Related) 2017-07-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3594 (Related) 2017-09-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
HB6084 (Related) 2018-07-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3309 (Related) 2018-09-10 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 723.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/6559/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr6559/BILLS-115hr6559ih.pdf |