US HB6531 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to take specified actions, as part of its management of the Strategic National Stockpile, to establish and maintain domestic reserves of critical medical supplies. Specifically, HHS must (1) create incentives for manufacturers of medical supplies to increase emergency stocks and diversify geographic production; (2) purchase, lease, or enter into joint ventures with respect to facilities and equipment to produce medical supplies; and (3) work with distributors to refresh and replenish medical supplies. HHS must also submit a report to Congress concerning the details of any purchase, lease, or joint venture. The department's authority under the bill to make purchases, leases, or joint ventures for medical supplies terminates on September 30, 2023.
Title
Medical Supplies for Pandemics Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN] | Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] |
Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN] | Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] |
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2020-04-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3827 (Same As) 2020-05-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB7574 (Related) 2020-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3827 (Same As) 2020-05-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB7574 (Related) 2020-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Immunology and vaccination
Manufacturing
Prescription drugs
Public contracts and procurement
Strategic materials and reserves
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Immunology and vaccination
Manufacturing
Prescription drugs
Public contracts and procurement
Strategic materials and reserves
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6531/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6531/BILLS-116hr6531ih.pdf |