US HB6502 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Introduced on April 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

COVID-19 Graduate Relief Act This bill allows students who graduate from institutions of higher education between January 1, 2020, and December 31, 2020, to defer payments on their federal student loans for up to three years. The Department of Education (ED) may extend deferment eligibility for one-year periods through December 31, 2022, if ED determines that the anticipated economic impact of the coronavirus (i.e., the virus that causes COVID-19 or another coronavirus with pandemic potential) on graduates of that year necessitates an extension. ED must consider certain factors, such as recent unemployment statistics from the Bureau of Labor Statistics, when determining whether to extend deferment eligibility to such graduates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COVID-19 Graduate Relief Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-14HouseReferred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
2020-04-14HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB3556 (Same As) 2020-03-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback