US HB650 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-17 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

America Votes Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

America Votes Act of 2019

Sponsors

Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA]Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX]Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]
Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]
Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]
Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD]Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]
Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH]
Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]
Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]
Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]
Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]
Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]
Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]
Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]
Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]
Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA]Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-17HouseReferred to the House Committee on House Administration.
2019-01-17HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
HB1275 (Related) 2019-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB549 (Related) 2019-02-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback