US HB6493 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on July 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Higher Education Act of 1965 to prevent certain alcohol and substance misuse.
Title
Campus Prevention and Recovery Services for Students Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Teresa Fernandez [D-NM] | Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS] |
Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. John Joyce [R-PA] | Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] |
Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL] | Rep. Sheila Cherfilus-McCormick [D-FL] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 371 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2022-06-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-06-23 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 371 - 49 (Roll no. 292). (text: CR H5842-5843) |
2022-06-23 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5855-5856) |
2022-06-23 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-06-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6493. |
2022-06-23 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5842-5845) |
2022-06-23 | House | Mr. Scott (VA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-06-23 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 294. |
2022-06-23 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and Labor. H. Rept. 117-384. |
2022-05-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2022-05-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-01-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2022-01-25 | House | Introduced in House |