US HB649 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-8)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize the Office on Violence Against Women to improve the handling of crimes of domestic violence, dating violence, sexual assault, and stalking by incorporating a trauma-informed approach into the initial response to and investigation of such crimes.
Title
Abby Honold Act
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] | Rep. James Hagedorn [R-MN] |
Rep. Michelle Fischbach [R-MN] | Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] |
Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] | Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] |
Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] |
Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] |
Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] | Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] | Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2021-02-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB119 (Same As) 2021-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1620 (Related) 2022-05-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR233 (Similar To) 2021-03-16 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB1620 (Related) 2022-05-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR233 (Similar To) 2021-03-16 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/649/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr649/BILLS-117hr649ih.pdf |