US HB6474 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-2)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Healthcare Broadband Expansion During COVID-19 Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Healthcare Broadband Expansion During COVID-19 Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-10HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2020-04-10HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB6800 (Related) 2020-06-01 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 455.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3838 (Related) 2020-05-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback