US HB6472 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Introduced on April 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

COVID-19 Price Gouging Prevention Act This bill makes it unlawful for any person to sell or offer for sale a consumer good or service during a public health emergency resulting from COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) at a price that (1) is unconscionably excessive, and (2) indicates that the seller is using the circumstances related to the public health emergency to increase prices unreasonably.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COVID-19 Price Gouging Prevention Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-07HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2020-04-07HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB6379 (Related) 2020-03-23 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB6450 (Related) 2020-04-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-06-01 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 455.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback