US HB6460 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on July 19 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

LIFT for Charities Act Lessen Impediments from Taxes for Charities Act This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to modify the requirements for determining the unrelated business taxable income of tax-exempt organizations. The bill repeals a provision that requires unrelated business taxable income to be increased by the amount of expenses paid or incurred by a tax-exempt organization for certain fringe benefits for which a tax deduction is not allowed, including benefits relating to transportation, parking, or an on-premises athletic facility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LIFT for Charities Act Lessen Impediments from Taxes for Charities Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-19HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
2018-07-19HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB6037 (Related) 2018-06-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB6504 (Related) 2018-07-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB3317 (Related) 2018-08-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3332 (Same As) 2018-08-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback