US HB6458 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-16 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-16 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to eliminate the requirement to specify an effective period of a transfer of Post-9/11 educational assistance to a dependent.
Title
To amend title 38, United States Code, to eliminate the requirement to specify an effective period of a transfer of Post-9/11 educational assistance to a dependent.
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Murphy [R-NC] | Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2022-02-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2022-01-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2022-01-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3606 (Same As) 2022-08-09 - Held at the desk.
HB6604 (Related) 2022-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 117-297.
HB6604 (Related) 2022-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 117-297.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/6458/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr6458/BILLS-117hr6458ih.pdf |