US HB6451 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish the Chiricahua National Park in the State of Arizona as a unit of the National Park System, and for other purposes.
Title
Chiricahua National Park Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2022-01-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2022-01-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1320 (Related) 2022-04-04 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/6451/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr6451/BILLS-117hr6451ih.pdf |