US HB6442 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-07 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 434.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-07 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 434.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 101703 of title 54, United States Code, to include Tribal Governments and quasi-governmental entities, and for other purposes.
Title
PACTS Act Partnership Agreements Creating Tangible Savings Act
Sponsors
Rep. Russ Fulcher [R-ID] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-07 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 434. |
2022-12-07 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-601. |
2022-07-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-07-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-07-13 | House | Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Discharged. |
2022-07-13 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2022-06-14 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2022-01-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2022-01-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2022-01-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2022-01-20 | House | Introduced in House |