US HB6397 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Higher Education Act of 1965 to provide for the refinancing of certain Federal student loans, and for other purposes.
Title
Coronavirus Emergency Student Loan Refinancing Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2020-03-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1707 (Related) 2019-03-13 - Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB3102 (Related) 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
HB4674 (Related) 2020-12-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 583.
SB768 (Related) 2019-03-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1845 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB3102 (Related) 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
HB4674 (Related) 2020-12-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 583.
SB768 (Related) 2019-03-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1845 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Education
Education programs funding
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Higher education
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Student aid and college costs
Education programs funding
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Higher education
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Student aid and college costs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6397/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6397/BILLS-116hr6397ih.pdf |